Financial history INTERNATIONAL ROAD ASSESSMENT PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1140357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.99m £2.05m £2.11m £2.19m £1.74m
Total expenditure £1.94m £1.96m £2.08m £2.14m £1.79m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £1.65m £1.79m £1.43m £1.08m
Income - Other trading activities £29.40k £1.69k £77.16k £11.32k £17.17k
Income - Charitable activities £836.09k £400.41k £243.16k £741.92k £642.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2.89k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.89k £5.33k £3.06k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.94m £1.96m £2.08m £2.14m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0