Trustees INTERNATIONAL ROAD ASSESSMENT PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1140357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raquel Barrios Quintanilla Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Ian Andrew Gillespie Trustee 02 June 2021
None on record
Shane O'Connor Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Dr Susan Sharland Trustee 04 March 2019
None on record
Ferdinand Emanuel Smith Trustee 14 January 2016
None on record
SAUL PETER BILLINGSLEY Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
MIQUEL NADAL Trustee
FIA FOUNDATION
Received: On time