HOPSCOTCH CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143199
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £5 £10.85k £12.40k £20.27k £26.88k
Total expenditure £0 £11.19k £11.80k £20.93k £26.75k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A