MUDEFORD WOOD COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1141612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 26 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download