Accounts and annual returns CITY OF CANTERBURY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1144320
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 04 February 2024 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 04 February 2024 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 27 November 2023 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 March 2022 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1299 days
Annual return 31 January 2019 27 February 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 27 February 2020 89 days late Download Open in new window