NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS TRUST

Charity number: 1145643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.35m £5.48m £5.34m £5.20m £4.67m
Total expenditure £5.28m £5.51m £5.36m £5.20m £4.75m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.10m £1.22m £1.11m £1.12m £2.05m
Income - Donations and legacies £35.05k £86.40k £33.86k £48.16k £27.94k
Income - Other trading activities £95.73k £146.19k £207.73k £143.20k £75.47k
Income - Charitable activities £5.21m £5.24m £5.09m £4.99m £4.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.95k £4.87k £6.73k £11.50k £5.87k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £50.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.21m £5.42m £5.23m £5.12m £4.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £72.62k £81.50k £130.16k £72.82k £50.75k
Expenditure - Governance £14.17k £17.24k £16.05k £15.15k £20.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0