Accounts and annual returns BUCKHURST PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1144530
Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 139 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 139 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window