Financial history STOKE YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1144349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.53k £57.25k £63.95k £56.05k £44.65k
Total expenditure £35.05k £51.22k £58.41k £24.17k £34.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £23.47k £34.54k