THE OPEN SPACES SOCIETY

Charity number: 1144840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Philip David Wadey Chair 11 July 2019 None on record
Steven Warr Trustee 03 June 2014 None on record
Simon Hunt Trustee 05 December 2019 None on record
John Hall Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
Stuart Bain Trustee 05 December 2019
THE WILDLIFE TRUST OF SOUTH AND WEST WALES LIMITED Received: On time
THE GLAMORGAN WILD LIFE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
Graham Martin Bathe Trustee 11 July 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER BENEY Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
Tara-Jane Sutcliffe Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record