Financial history BRENT COMMUNITY LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1146239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £283.39k £283.39k £287.85k £474.34k £17.17k
Total expenditure £248.43k £248.43k £333.99k £361.35k £65.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £120.00k £178.94k £142.84k £8.17k
Income from government grants £134.02k N/A £42.20k N/A N/A