Accounts and annual returns BELARUS FREE THEATRE
Charity number: 1147372

Charity reporting is up to date (119 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 January 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 January 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 24 September 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 24 September 2018 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window