Trustees BIRMINGHAM MUSEUMS TRUST
Charity number: 1147014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Niels de Vos | Chair | 20 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Jess Phillips MP | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Stephenson | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Simpson | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Darbon | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Porter | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sapreena Kumari | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Cambray Alden | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Davis MBE | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clive Lewis Bawden | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Louise Brooke-Smith | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Diviney | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonnie Turpie | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.