THE CHARNWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 502610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 20 March 2017 On time Download