THE CHARNWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 502610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £662.86k £706.36k £1.11m £850.17k £745.69k
Total expenditure £653.36k £713.33k £856.73k £863.70k £767.61k
Income from government contracts £510.90k £534.78k £565.84k £621.48k £593.07k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £200.00k N/A £20.03k
Income - Donations and legacies £72.32k £86.05k £392.99k £92.09k £71.72k
Income - Other trading activities £5.13k £16.63k £14.04k £12.91k £6.51k
Income - Charitable activities £580.49k £603.13k £700.02k £745.00k £667.45k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £902 £550 £132 £182 £8
Income - Other £4.01k £0 £200 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £14.00k £1.39k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £642.87k £711.25k £854.74k £862.11k £767.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.69k £2.08k £2.00k £1.59k £414
Expenditure - Governance £5.63k £7.73k £8.34k £5.16k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.80k £0 £0 £0 £0