Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, NORWICH
Charity number: 1147706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MADELINE MARGARET LIGHT | Chair | 11 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Janet Susan Terry | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aimee-Marie Taylor Gedge | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olufunnke Abidemi Olugboji | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Luscombe | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Terry | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Daynes | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Elizabeth Walter-Browne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Fifield | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Humphreys | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Frederick Tracey Gilbert | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Ferdinand Emmrich | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gail Halley | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Elizabeth Daniels | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Stapleford Pink | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.