Accounts and annual returns ZURIEL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1146382
Charity reporting is overdue by 251 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 251 days
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 251 days
Annual return 10 November 2021 07 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 November 2020 26 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 November 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 November 2018 20 August 2020 345 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2018 Not Required