CYCLISTS' TOURING CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CyclingUK's vision is of a healthier, happier and cleaner world, because more people cycle. We want people of all ages, backgrounds and abilities to be able to cycle safely, easily and enjoyably. We promote all forms of cycling, protect the interests of existing and would-be cyclists, and inspire people of all ages, backgrounds and abilities to discover the joys of cycling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income:
£14,287,236
Donations and legacies | £512.28k | |
Charitable activities | £13.19m | |
Other trading activities | £331.02k | |
Investments | £139.65k | |
Other | £119.16k |
Total expenditure:
£13,197,647
Raising funds | £319.53k | |
Charitable activities | £12.88m | |
Other | £0 |
-£192,180 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £198,759 from 7 government contract(s) and £10,221,575 from 14 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £319.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.88m | |
Retained for future use | £1.09m |
People
184 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
8281 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 February 2005: Standard registration
- CTC - THE UK'S NATIONAL CYCLISTS ORGANISATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JANET ATHERTON | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robin Oliver Martin Grant | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Jayne Kerr | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Edward Toussaint-Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marsh | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Clifford Tucker | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Smith | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gibbons | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Macnae | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Baker | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Carroll | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.58m | £6.55m | £11.79m | £9.93m | £14.29m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.72m | £6.50m | £12.44m | £9.78m | £13.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £181.39k | £189.29k | £418.76k | £198.76k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.19m | £1.88m | £6.20m | £5.66m | £10.22m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £808.07k | £198.17k | £597.92k | £121.85k | £512.28k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £328.54k | £288.13k | £343.99k | £337.00k | £331.02k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.44m | £6.05m | £10.83m | £9.33m | £13.19m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.35k | £16.24k | £20.90k | £18.27k | £139.65k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £122.63k | £119.16k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £751.75k | £125.68k | £420.73k | £4.22k | £389.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.72m | £6.20m | £11.93m | £9.45m | £12.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £300.79k | £504.29k | £331.65k | £319.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £266.19k | £267.66k | £404.39k | £403.82k | £508.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £250.91k | £174.42k | £3.06m | £2.36m | £2.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.32m | £1.37m | £1.51m | £1.72m | £1.78m | |
|
Long-term investments | £462.33k | £493.16k | £550.13k | £1.06m | £1.45m | |
|
Other assets | £6.42m | £6.93m | £6.49m | £13.56m | £9.32m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.03m | £2.54m | £2.87m | £10.51m | £5.82m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 16 October 2019 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 16 October 2019 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/10/1887 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAY 2017 as amended on 04 Sep 2020 as amended on 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROMOTING THE AMATEUR SPORT OF CYCLING, CYCLE TOURING AND ASSOCIATED AMATEUR SPORTS; 2. PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING CYCLING AND THE SAFETY OF CYCLISTS; 3. ADVANCE EDUCATION BY WHATEVER MEANS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF CYCLING, TRAINING AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES RELATED TO CYCLING; 4. PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Linked charities
- 10 February 2005 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cycling UK
Parklands
Railton Road
Guildford
GU2 9JX
- Phone:
- 01483238304
- Email:
- cycling@cyclinguk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window