Accounts and annual returns GILLINGHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146565
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required