Accounts and annual returns ROCK OF REFUGE TRIUMPHANT MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1147026
Charity reporting is overdue by 134 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 134 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 13 February 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 March 2022 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 18 January 2021 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 18 January 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required