SOUTHPORT SPOTLIGHTS MUSICAL THEATRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 502783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 02 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 02 December 2017 On time Download