Accounts and annual returns YOUTH UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 27 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 15 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 18 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 18 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 13 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window