Accounts and annual returns Sandwell Aquatics Club

Charity number: 1147581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 27 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 19 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 25 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window