LCGC

Charity number: 1148739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 February 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required