Accounts and annual returns The L20 Hub

Charity number: 1147852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window