Accounts and annual returns CTU COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1148689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window