THE FINLAY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1148996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 10 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required