WEYMOUTH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 1148603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Jane Hardy Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Henry Keith Holdaway Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
James William Farquharson Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Ronald William Martin Trustee 21 March 2018 None on record
Chris Moyle Trustee 05 January 2018 None on record
Maxine Elisabeth Foster Trustee 04 January 2019 None on record
GERALD TREMAIN MABB Trustee 30 July 2012 None on record
Pauline Crump Trustee 23 February 2018 None on record
Graham John Perry Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Graham Stuart Dewey Trustee 09 March 2020 None on record
Jonathan Turner Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record