THE VENTURE (WREXHAM) LIMITED

Charity number: 1153454
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £353.16k £282.37k £338.92k £343.95k £310.25k
Total expenditure £342.36k £302.01k £259.77k £349.65k £341.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £57.96k £169.60k £177.77k £193.69k
Income from government grants £234.91k £224.41k £8.01k £30.09k £12.16k