Financial history THE CONSTRUCTION SECTOR TRANSPARENCY INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1152236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.50m £2.05m £2.24m £1.46m £641.68k
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.78m £2.18m £1.52m £956.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.29m £2.05m £2.01m £1.20m £367.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.50m £2.05m £2.24m £1.46m £641.65k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £51 £411 £1.83k £398 £32
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.66m £1.78m £2.18m £1.52m £950.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.26k £0 £6.05k £6.00k £6.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £923.31k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £6.00k £6.18k