MERTHYR CYNON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1149296
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 13 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 02 March 2017 On time Download