Financial history BISON IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1149297
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.45m £2.34m £2.14m £1.52m £6.06m
Total expenditure £2.44m £2.34m £2.14m £1.52m £4.54m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £30.00k £108.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.64k £0 £0 £250.49k £108.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.41m £2.31m £2.10m £1.24m £5.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £31.39k £35.86k £43.73k £25.14k £70.57k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.34m £2.14m £1.52m £4.54m
Expenditure - Raising funds -£51.72k £1 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £18.04k £2.92k £27.33k £40.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management -£51.72k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0