Accounts and annual returns OPEN WING TRUST

Charity number: 1149773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required