Financial history GUBA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.54k £9.16k £10.05k £11.11k £46.42k
Total expenditure £2.04k £3.75k £6.78k £6.39k £51.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A