293RD BIRMINGHAM (ST FAITH AND ST LAURENCE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 503303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 November 2020 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 February 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 June 2017 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required