RED ROSE RECOVERY LANCASHIRE

Charity number: 1152474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £698.85k £881.17k £660.82k £647.11k £725.68k
Total expenditure £563.86k £902.13k £638.46k £701.99k £659.87k
Income from government contracts £575 £380.00k £381 £365.60k £351.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.05k £5.22k £3.76k £3.72k £1.55k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £684.30k £875.46k £657.06k £643.39k £724.13k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £501 £486 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £13.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £563.86k £902.13k £638.46k £701.99k £659.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0