WARRINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 03 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 10 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 10 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 03 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 30 January 2017 On time Download