WARRINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1152525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID GEORGE OKELL Trustee 21 September 2016 None on record
Anne Tobiasen Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
Paul Martin Crane Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record
Andrew McDade Trustee 09 July 2014
THE MARANATHA COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
Melvin Jason Allmark Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
SUSAN BLYTH Trustee 09 May 2013
ROOM AT THE INN AND THE 'Y' PROJECT Received: On time
Margaret Pennell Trustee 09 July 2014 None on record
DAVID MCDONALD Trustee 09 May 2013
RISLEY INDEPENDENT METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
Hilda Ann Whitfield Chair 09 July 2014 None on record