Accounts and annual returns ARF TRUST

Charity number: 1157874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 July 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2018 08 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 July 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 July 2017 Not Required