Accounts and annual returns ETHNIC YOUTH SUPPORT TEAM

Charity number: 1152486
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window