THE BESOM IN TAUNTON

Charity number: 1152511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 10 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required