"R&R" (RESTORE AND RESETTLE)LTD

Charity number: 1152800
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 96 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 461 days
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 27 April 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required