THE BERKELEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152596
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 02 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 11 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 08 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 08 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)