Accounts and annual returns MAMA MADINO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156878
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 98 days
Annual return 11 March 2022 18 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2021 14 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 11 March 2019 10 February 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 March 2019 Not Required