JERRY GREEN DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1155042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 September 2017 On time Download