THE GESTALT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Core activities are Counselling and Psychotherapy training in Gestalt methods. The Centre also runs short courses and workshops for people who are in psychological distress, wish to explore, reflect and work on their psychological health. The Centre runs a low cost scheme which supports the provision of counselling for people who have limited resources and are in need of psychological help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income:
£920,134
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £919.99k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £147 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£868,854
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £868.85k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £868.85k | |
Retained for future use | £51.28k |
People
22 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 10 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART ANTHONY RENSHAW | Chair | 14 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Frances Elizabeth Hackett | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
They Jason Sloan | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sean Leonard Arnold | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Gilead Yeffett | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £861.06k | £835.04k | £851.83k | £812.82k | £920.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £732.83k | £756.18k | £781.64k | £661.30k | £868.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £861.06k | £832.37k | £851.83k | £782.45k | £919.99k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £147 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £2.68k | £0 | £30.37k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £732.83k | £756.18k | £781.64k | £661.30k | £868.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £4.96k | £5.50k | £0 | £5.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £112.56k | £95.08k | £72.93k | £62.67k | £50.14k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £646.07k | £729.13k | £1.02m | £1.37m | £1.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £564.08k | £585.15k | £783.16k | £970.86k | £982.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 October 2023 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 16 April 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 16 April 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/07/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR: (1) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN GESTALT THERAPY PHILOSOPHY, THEORY AND PRACTICE (2) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN OTHER PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPIES AND ALLIED PROFESSIONS (3) TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE WIDER SOCIETY THROUGH SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; AND (4) TO ENSURE THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF GESTALT ARE MAINTAINED IN THE PURSUANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gestalt Centre
15-23 St. Pancras Way
LONDON
NW1 0PT
- Phone:
- 02073835610
- Email:
- enquire@gestaltcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window