AGE CONCERN NORTH WALES CENTRAL

Charity number: 1154403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £295.95k £397.04k £386.26k £330.97k £266.98k
Total expenditure £327.24k £414.53k £369.75k £324.70k £277.98k
Income from government contracts £79.56k £65.03k N/A £177.19k £149.25k
Income from government grants £66.00k £0 £257.31k N/A N/A