Accounts and annual returns SCHOOLS OUT UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1156352
Charity reporting is overdue by 237 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 May 2023 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 May 2023 193 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 May 2023 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 May 2023 557 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window