Accounts and annual returns ART AID CIO

Charity number: 1155349
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022
Annual return 31 December 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1690 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1690 days