Trustees GLOUCESTERSHIRE RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE CENTRE
Charity number: 1155902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Catherine Hemingway | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Limbrick | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julia Davey | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hale | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Honor Binning | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Vincent | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Stoddart | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jones | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bromley | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Norton | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr LOUISE LIVESEY | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.