MINORITY COMMUNITY AID

Charity number: 1160722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £21.97k £22.00k £40.60k £47.40k £30.10k
Total expenditure £20.90k £21.10k £26.84k £32.60k £26.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.00k N/A N/A N/A